+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 90, Statutes of 2013.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
On August 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2673.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 15).
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 676.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Correa.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
August 22, 2013: SCR 34 Correa Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
August 15, 2013: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
April 25, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SCR34 Correa
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor