+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 67, Statutes of 2013.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:15 a.m.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 1680.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On June 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2131.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20).
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 496.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
July 8, 2013: Unfinished Business SCR33 Gaines Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Present/NV: 9
June 20, 2013: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 11, 2013: Special Consent Cal SCR33 Gaines
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (71)
Type:
Primary Sponsor