+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 87, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2316.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 15).
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1405.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Pan.
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
June 22, 2017: SCR 31 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
June 15, 2017: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 15, 2017: Noes:
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 5, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SCR31 Pan
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor