+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2361.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 843.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 14.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (8)
July 13, 2015: SCR 30 Hill Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 13, 2015: SCR 30 Hill Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 8, 2015: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 3
June 22, 2015: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
June 22, 2015: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
April 30, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd SCR30 Hill
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 5
April 14, 2015: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 14, 2015: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor