+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (11)
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 2, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:15 a.m.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 120.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On January 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 199.) Ordered to the Senate.
On January 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 22).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On January 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 80.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On December 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (2)
January 29, 2015: Unfinished Business SCR3 Mendoza Concurrence
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 2
January 16, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SCR3 Mendoza
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor