+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (5)
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 27. Noes 4. Page 582.)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 537.) (March 29).
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (2)
April 3, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SR27 Wieckowski
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 9
March 29, 2017: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor