+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On August 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
On August 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4398.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 3, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 5813.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 26).
On June 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3927.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
August 11, 2014: Unfinished Business SJR27 Padilla Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
July 3, 2014: SJR 27 Padilla Senate Third Reading
- Yeas: 72
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
June 26, 2014: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SJR27 Padilla
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (64)
Type:
Primary Sponsor