+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2013.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2724.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
On August 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1045.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 760.) (April 30).
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On April 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (5)
August 26, 2013: SCR 27 Jackson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
August 21, 2013: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
August 12, 2013: Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2013: Consent Calendar 2nd SCR27 Jackson
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
April 30, 2013: Be adopted as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 11