+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 78, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On May 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2004.) Ordered to the Senate.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 26).
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 409.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
May 31, 2017: SCR 26 Mendoza Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
May 26, 2017: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
March 20, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SCR26 Mendoza
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor