+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On September 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 189, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On August 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5599.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 67. Noes 1. Page 6523.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4882.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On August 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On August 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
August 31, 2016: SJR 26 De León Senate Third Reading By GARCIA, E.
- Yeas: 67
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 12
August 31, 2016: Unfinished Business (Supplemental File 3) SJR26 De León Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
August 30, 2016: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 5
August 11, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SJR26 De León
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor