+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 127, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1983.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2360.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 7).
On June 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
On April 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 558.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Senator Block.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 507.) (April 6).
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
July 16, 2015: Unfinished Business SCR25 Block Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
July 7, 2015: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
April 13, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SCR25 Block
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 5
April 6, 2015: Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (74)
Type:
Primary Sponsor