+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On July 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 106, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
On July 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2541.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 10).
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1074.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 858.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
July 13, 2017: SCR 25 Portantino Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 4
July 10, 2017: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
May 15, 2017: Consent Calendar 2nd SCR25
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor