+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 114, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
On June 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5978.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 19).
On May 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5037.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
June 25, 2018: SJR 25 Wilk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
June 19, 2018: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
May 14, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SJR25 Wilk et al.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1