+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- June 20 hearing: Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 1.)
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P.E., R., & S.S.
On May 29, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 4343.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4312.) (May 25).
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- May 7 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 7.
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 4790.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on P.E. & R. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4629.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On April 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P.E. & R.
On March 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (6)
June 20, 2018: Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 1
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
May 29, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SJR24 Jackson
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 6
May 25, 2018: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 7, 2018: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2018: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 10, 2018: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Employment and Retirement]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor