+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 107, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2361.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1073.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 907.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 5.
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (8)
July 13, 2015: SCR 22 Morrell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 13, 2015: SCR 22 Morrell Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
July 8, 2015: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 3
June 22, 2015: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
June 22, 2015: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 16
May 22, 2015: Consent Calendar 2nd SCR22 Morrell
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 5, 2015: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 5, 2015: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor