+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 309.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Ordered to third reading.
- From committee:
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Vote
March 18, 2013: Special Consent Cal SCR21 Emmerson
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor