+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On July 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:45 p.m.
On July 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2066.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On May 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate.
On May 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (May 15).
On May 10, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 872.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
July 17, 2017: Unfinished Business SCR21 De León Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
May 26, 2017: SCR 21 De León Senate Third Reading By COOLEY
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 4
May 15, 2017: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
April 27, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SCR21 De León
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor