+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 139, Statutes of 2019.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On August 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2266.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2805.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14).
On July 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Coauthors revised.
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1005.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 806.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (6)
August 26, 2019: Unfinished Business SCR21 Bates et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 22, 2019: SCR 21 Bates Senate Third Reading By Brough
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
August 14, 2019: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 18
July 1, 2019: Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
May 9, 2019: Consent Calendar SCR21
- Yeas: 38
April 23, 2019: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12