+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2013.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:45 p.m.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On February 25, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 397.) Ordered to the Senate.
On February 19, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar.
On February 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 15).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 132.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From committee:
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
February 25, 2013: SJR 2 Jackson Senate Third Reading By LOWENTHAL
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
February 15, 2013: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SJR2 Jackson
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 7
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor