+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 29, Statutes of 2013.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 776.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On April 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On April 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1157.) Ordered to the Senate.
On April 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 15).
On April 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On March 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 309.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Ordered to third reading.
- From committee:
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2013: Unfinished Business SCR17 Anderson
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 1
April 15, 2013: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 11
March 18, 2013: Special Consent Cal SCR17 Anderson
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (75)
Type:
Primary Sponsor