+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On September 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 236, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On August 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6671.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 23, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 23).
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5264.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On August 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On August 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
August 27, 2018: SCR 163 Portantino Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 80
August 23, 2018: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
August 13, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SCR163 Portantino
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor