+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 165, Statutes of 2015.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:45 p.m.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 3, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2847.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 27).
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1984.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On July 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
September 3, 2015: SJR 16 De León Senate Third Reading By BURKE
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 27, 2015: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
July 16, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SJR16 De León
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor