+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On September 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 182, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On August 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6516.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 29, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 29).
On August 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4870.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On August 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On July 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 1.
On June 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4621.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 28.
On June 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- June 21 hearing postponed by committee.
- Set for hearing June 21.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
August 31, 2016: SCR 149 Gaines Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2016: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
August 11, 2016: Consent Calendar 2nd SCR149 Gaines
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
June 28, 2016: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor