+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 111, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
On June 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5933.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14).
On May 31, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4223.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
June 21, 2018: SCR 142 Gaines Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
June 14, 2018: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
May 21, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SCR142 Gaines
- Yeas: 39
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor