+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On May 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5564.) Ordered to the Senate.
On May 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 25).
On May 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5080.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
May 30, 2018: SCR 141 Moorlach Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
May 25, 2018: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
May 17, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SCR141 Moorlach et al.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor