+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 149, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
On August 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4992.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 29, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6716.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 27, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On August 22, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 14, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4363.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On July 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
August 29, 2014: SCR 135 Evans Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
August 29, 2014: Unfinished Supp 4 SCR135 Evans Concurrence
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
August 27, 2014: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 5
August 7, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SCR135 Evans
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor