+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:15 p.m.
On August 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 20, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6249.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 18).
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4297.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
August 20, 2014: SCR 132 Lieu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 18, 2014: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
August 4, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SCR132 Lieu
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor