+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 7, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On August 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On August 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4297.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Vote
August 4, 2014: Senate 3rd Reading SCR131 Gaines
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor