+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On September 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 132, Statutes of 2013.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 2365.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read. Amended. Adopted. (Ayes 57. Noes 7. Page 3003.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 27).
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On July 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On July 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 1. Page 1604.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
September 11, 2013: Unfinished Business SJR13 Yee Concurrence
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
September 9, 2013: SJR 13 Yee Senate Third Reading By ALEJO
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 7
- Present/NV: 14
August 27, 2013: From committee: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SJR13 Yee
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 8
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor