+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 105, Statutes of 2016.
On August 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m.
On August 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5781.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 8, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 8).
On June 23, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 20, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On June 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4397.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file on motion of Senator Lara.
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Lara.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
August 11, 2016: SCR 127 Lara Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
August 8, 2016: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 20, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SCR127 Lara
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor