+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On August 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2014.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:15 a.m.
On August 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 21, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6303.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 19).
On August 18, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 26, 2014 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On June 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4142.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On June 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 23.
On June 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3846.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 10.
On June 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (5)
August 21, 2014: SCR 125 Corbett Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 19, 2014: Be adopted, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 4
August 18, 2014: Be adopted, and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
June 26, 2014: Consent Calendar 2nd SCR125 Corbett
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 8
June 10, 2014: Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor