+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m.
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3799.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On April 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On April 28, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4597.) Ordered to the Senate.
On April 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25).
On April 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3459.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (4)
May 9, 2016: Unfinished Business SCR121 Wieckowski Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 28, 2016: SCR 121 Wieckowski Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
April 25, 2016: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 11, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SCR121 Wieckowski
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor