+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2016.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
On April 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 4225.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended.
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 7).
On April 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3349.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
April 7, 2016: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
April 7, 2016: SCR 120 Hill Senate Third Reading By MULLIN
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
March 31, 2016: Senate 3rd Reading SCR120 Hill
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor