+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On March 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor