+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 546.)
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 518.) (March 16).
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 16.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 18, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SR12 Min et al.
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
March 16, 2021: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor