+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 81, Statutes of 2021.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2282.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5).
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on TRANS.
On May 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1063.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 781.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (3)
+ − Votes (4)
July 8, 2021: SCR 12 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
July 5, 2021: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
May 10, 2021: Consent Calendar SCR12
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
April 13, 2021: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor