+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On August 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration granted.
- August 15 hearing: Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 5325.)
On August 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 15.
On August 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- August 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On August 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 8.
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (2)
August 15, 2018: [08-15-2018] hearing: Motion to Reconsider. [Reconsideration Granted.]
- Yeas: 7
August 15, 2018: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading
- Yeas: 2
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor