+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2017.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 724.) Ordered to the Senate.
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 16).
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 175.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On February 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On January 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
March 23, 2017: SCR 11 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
March 16, 2017: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
February 13, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SCR11 Pan
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor