+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2022.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4744.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Coauthors revised.
On May 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 12).
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3582.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 19, 2022: SCR 104 Limón Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 6
May 12, 2022: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 2, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SCR104 Limón
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (62)
Type:
Primary Sponsor