+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 60, Statutes of 2018.
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
On May 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On May 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5008.) Ordered to the Senate.
On April 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26).
On April 2, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On March 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4381.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Votes (3)
May 3, 2018: SCR 103 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 7
April 26, 2018: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
March 15, 2018: Senate 3rd Reading SCR103 Fuller
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor