+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Died on the inactive file.
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Mendoza.
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Mitchell.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2717.)
- Reconsideration granted.
- Motion to reconsider made by Senator Mendoza.
- Read third time. Refused adoption. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 2717.)
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to second reading.
On August 31, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2216.) (August 27).
On August 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 27.
On August 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- August 17 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing August 17.
On July 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1855.) (July 7).
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing July 7.
On July 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1733.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On June 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing July 1.
On May 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after June 11.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 10, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SCA8 Mendoza
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
September 10, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SCA8 Mendoza Reconsider
- Yeas: 40
August 27, 2015: Be adopted
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
August 17, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
July 7, 2015: Be adopted as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
July 7, 2015: Be adopted as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2015: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
July 1, 2015: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor