+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On June 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 1421.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On June 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 18.
On May 16, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 937.) (May 15). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On February 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A.
On December 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
On December 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2013: Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules.
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
May 15, 2013: Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor