+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On July 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On July 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., E. & C.A., and APPR.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 26.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor