+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On April 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On August 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing September 3.
- Joint Rule 61(a)(12) suspended. (Ayes 27. Noes 4. Page 2044.)
On August 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on P.E. & R., ED., and E. & C.A.
On August 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On August 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED., P.E. & R., and E. & C.A.
On July 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after August 10.
On July 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.