+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On November 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- May 3 set for first hearing.Testimony taken.
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3608.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On March 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on ED., JUD., and E. & C.A.
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Vote
April 20, 2016: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor