+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2021.
On August 31, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 60. Noes 2. Page 2562.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (June 8).
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 750.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 689.) (April 6).
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (4)
August 30, 2021: SJR 2 Hueso Senate Third Reading By REYES
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 17
June 8, 2021: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
April 12, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SJR2 Hueso et al.
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 6
April 6, 2021: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor