+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10:30 a.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 113, Statutes of 2022.
On August 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 5710.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 8).
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 31. Noes 0. Page 3473.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3255.) (March 29).
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 29.
On March 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (4)
+ − Votes (4)
August 1, 2022: SJR 12 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia
- Yeas: 63
- Present/NV: 17
June 8, 2022: Be adopted. To third reading.
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 2
April 21, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SJR12 Skinner et al.
- Yeas: 31
- Present/NV: 9
March 29, 2022: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (65)
Type:
Primary Sponsor