+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On November 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee without further action.
On June 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- June 23 hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 23.
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- June 18 hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 18.
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 9.
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3. Page 3632.) (June 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 2.
On May 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
- Referral to Com. on E. & C.A. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
On July 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on G.O. and E. & C.A.
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after July 28.
On June 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
June 9, 2020: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
June 2, 2020: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor