+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 97, Statutes of 2022.
On June 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 5553.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 23, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Rule 46 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 17. Page 5503.)
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
- From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 23).
On June 20, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 4306.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules suspended
- (Ayes 25. Noes 9. Page 4259.)
- From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4278.) (June 16).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 16 in APPR pending receipt.
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 4206.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
- From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 4206.) (June 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 14.
- Set for hearing June 14 in E. & C.A. pending receipt.
On June 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- From printer.
- Referred to Coms. on JUD., E. & C.A., and APPR.
On June 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (5)
June 27, 2022: SCA 10 Atkins Senate Third Reading By RENDON
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 5
June 20, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SCA10 Atkins et al.
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
June 16, 2022: Be adopted
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 14, 2022: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2022: Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (75)
Type:
Primary Sponsor