+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2022.
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On May 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4743.) Ordered to the Senate.
On May 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 12).
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Held at Desk.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3580.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Ordered to third reading.
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.
+ − Analyses (2)
+ − Votes (3)
May 19, 2022: SCR 96 Min Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 6
May 12, 2022: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 2, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SCR96 Min et al.
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
+ − Sponsors (68)
Type:
Primary Sponsor